VA HB1832 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Highway Corporation Act; alteration of certificate of authority; powers and duties of the State Corporation Commission. Requires any application for a transfer, extension, or amendment of a certificate of authority issued under the Virginia Highway Corporation Act to include information demonstrating the financial fitness of the entity applying to operate the roadway. The bill requires an applicant for a toll increase to provide a forward-looking analysis return that will be reviewed by the Department of Transportation that demonstrates that the proposed rates will be reasonable to the user in relation to the benefit obtained, not likely to materially discourage use of the roadway, and provide the operator no more than a reasonable return. The bill also prohibits the State Corporation Commission from authorizing a toll increase if these criteria are not met or if the proposed increase is for more than one year. The bill requires an operator to receive approval from the Commission prior to refinancing any existing debt. Virginia Highway Corporation Act; alteration of certificate of authority; powers and duties of the State Corporation Commission. Requires any application for a transfer, extension, or amendment of a certificate of authority issued under the Virginia Highway Corporation Act to include information demonstrating the financial fitness of the entity applying to operate the roadway. The bill requires an applicant for a toll increase to provide a forward-looking analysis return that will be reviewed by the Department of Transportation that demonstrates that the proposed rates will be reasonable to the user in relation to the benefit obtained, not likely to materially discourage use of the roadway, and provide the operator no more than a reasonable return. The bill also prohibits the State Corporation Commission from authorizing a toll increase if these criteria are not met or if the proposed increase is for more than one year. The bill requires an operator to receive approval from the Commission prior to refinancing any existing debt.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Highway Corporation Act; alteration of certificate of authority, powers and duties of SCC.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-29HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-29HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-28HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1832H1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103413D-H1
2021-01-28HouseRead second time
2021-01-27HouseRead first time
2021-01-26HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103413D-H1
2021-01-26HouseReported from Transportation with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 1-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101393D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1832
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1832+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1832H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103413D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103413.pdf
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1901V0011+HB1832
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1901V0018+HB1832
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H19V0026+HB1832
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H19V0032+HB1832
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1240+HB1832
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S02V0069+HB1832

Bill Comments

feedback