VA HB1832 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plate; Navy and Marine Corps Medal. Creates a special license plate for persons awarded the Navy and Marine Corps Medal or for unremarried surviving spouses of such persons.
Title
License plates, special; Navy and Marine Corps Medal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0074) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 74 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 22, 2019 | |
2019-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 15, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-13 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1832ER) |
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-23 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1832H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19104952D-H1 |
2019-01-22 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee substitute printed 19104952D-H1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | House committee, floor amendments and substitutes offered |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101267D |