VA HB1831 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1831

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Home care organizations; personal care services; supervision; regulations. Directs the Board of Health to include in regulations governing home care organizations a provision for supervision of home care attendants providing personal care services by a licensed nurse through use of interactive audio or video technology. Home care organizations; personal care services; supervision; regulations. Directs the Board of Health to include in regulations governing home care organizations a provision for supervision of home care attendants providing personal care services by a licensed nurse through use of interactive audio or video technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home care organizations; personal care services by a nurse through use of audio or video technology.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
2021-03-31 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-01 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-01HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
2021-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-02-25SenateSigned by President
2021-02-25HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1831ER)
2021-02-25HouseEnrolled
2021-02-22SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
2021-02-22SenateRead third time
2021-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18SenateReported from Education and Health (14-Y 1-N)
2021-02-12SenateAssigned Education sub: Health
2021-02-10SenateRereferred to Education and Health
2021-02-10SenateRereferred from Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 21100823D-E
2021-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1831E
2021-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-25HouseRead second time
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100823D

Same As/Similar To

HB1831 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321162.12(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1831
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1831+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1831E+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1831ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0470+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1831AH
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1831F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1831FE122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1831FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H1201C0001+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0049+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC1117+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0054+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0002+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S04V0061+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0228HB1831+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0270HB1831+HB1831

Bill Comments 750

feedback