VA HB1831 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Home care organizations; personal care services; supervision; regulations. Directs the Board of Health to include in regulations governing home care organizations a provision for supervision of home care attendants providing personal care services by a licensed nurse through use of audio-only telephone communication.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home care organizations; personal care services through audio-video telephone communication.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-26HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 21100823D-E
2021-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1831E
2021-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-01-25HouseRead second time
2021-01-22HouseRead first time
2021-01-21HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment(s) (21-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N)
2021-01-15HouseAssigned HWI sub: Health
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100823D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
321162.12(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1831
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1831+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1831E+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+amd+HB1831AH
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103266A.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1831F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1831FE122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1201V0001+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H12V0049+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1056+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1117+HB1831
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S09V0054+HB1831

Bill Comments 750

feedback