VA HB1831 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Prioritization of statewide transportation projects; exceptions. Exempts projects on U.S. Route 121, commonly known as the Coalfield Expressway, and U.S. Route 460 from the prioritization process that the Commonwealth Transportation Board applies to projects for state funding.
Title
Prioritization of statewide transportation projects; exceptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Transportation |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-13 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2017-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101984D |
Subjects
Commissions Boards and Institutions Generally
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Route 121
Route 460
Transportation
Highways and Other Surface Transportation Systems
Route 121
Route 460
Transportation
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1831 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1831+hil |