VA HB1831 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Low-income taxpayer tax credit. Allows low-income individuals and married persons to claim a refundable income tax credit equal to 10 percent of the federal earned income tax credit claimed by the individual or married persons for the year in lieu of the current options available for claiming the credit. Under current law, low-income individuals and married persons may claim (i) a nonrefundable income tax credit equal to $300 for each of the individual, his spouse, and any dependents or (ii) a nonrefundable income tax credit equal to 20 percent of the federal earned income tax credit claimed by the individual or married persons for the year. The changes in the bill would become effective beginning with taxable year 2015.
Title
Income tax, state; tax credit for low-income taxpayer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in Finance |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102342D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1831 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1831+hil |