VA HB183 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-25 - Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Libraries; assessment for costs in civil actions; disbursement for law libraries. Increases from $4 to $7 the maximum assessment a county, city, or town may make as part of the costs incident to each civil action filed in the courts located within its boundaries. Such funds are disbursed by a locality's governing body for the establishment, use, and maintenance of its law library.
Title
Libraries; assessment for costs in civil actions, disbursement for law libraries.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) (Y: 64 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-29 | House | VOTE: Passage (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-29 | House | Read third time and passed House (64-Y 35-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-27 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported from General Laws (17-Y 4-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101008D |