VA HB1828 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1828
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-2)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles; powers and duties. Authorizes the Commissioner of the Department of Motor Vehicles, for the duration of a declared state of emergency and for up to 90 days after it has been rescinded or expires, to (i) extend the validity or delay the cancellation of driver's licenses, special identification cards, and vehicle registrations; (ii) extend the time frame during which a driver improvement clinic or payment plan may be completed; (iii) extend the maximum number of days of residency permitted before a new resident must be licensed in Virginia to operate a motor vehicle in the Commonwealth; and (iv) extend the time frame during which a new resident may operate a motor vehicle in the Commonwealth that has been registered in another jurisdiction before registering the vehicle in the Commonwealth.
Title
Commissioner of DMV; powers and duties during a declared state of emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (12-Y 2-N) (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (85-Y 15-N) (Y: 85 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0129) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 129 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2021 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1828ER) |
2021-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Transportation (12-Y 2-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (85-Y 15-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (85-Y 15-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation (20-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Motor Vehicles |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102068D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1828 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)