VA HB1826 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Board of Education; membership; qualifications. Requires the nine-member Board of Education to include at least one member with experience or expertise in local government leadership or policymaking, at least one member with experience or expertise in career and technical education, and at least one member with experience or expertise in early childhood education, all of whom are appointed by the Governor.
Title
Education, Board of; qualifications of members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) (Y: 3 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (3-Y 5-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned Education sub: SOL and SOQ |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101302D |