VA HB1825 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1825ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 8 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-08 - Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1825ER)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Beach Sports or Entertainment Project; bond issuance. Amends provisions related to bond issuance for purposes of the Virginia Beach Sports or Entertainment Project. The bill (i) enables bonds to be issued with maturities no later than the expiration of the City of Virginia Beach's entitlement to certain sales and use tax and (ii) clarifies the authority of the City of Virginia Beach to issue refunding bonds.
Title
Virginia Beach Sports or Entertainment Project; amends provisions related to bond issuance.
Sponsors
Del. Alex Askew [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N 1-A) (Y: 35 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) (Y: 80 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment(s) (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1825ER) |
2021-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (35-Y 3-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-20 | House | VOTE: Passage (80-Y 19-N) |
2021-01-20 | House | Read third time and passed House (80-Y 19-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-18 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-15 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 1-N) |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101872D |