VA HB1824 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; disclosures for a buyer to beware; mold. Adds to the provision of the required disclosure statement directing a buyer to beware and exercise necessary due diligence with respect to determining the condition of real property or any improvements thereon a provision advising the buyer to obtain a mold assessment conducted by a business that follows the guidelines provided by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; disclosures for a buyer to beware; mold. Adds to the provision of the required disclosure statement directing a buyer to beware and exercise necessary due diligence with respect to determining the condition of real property or any improvements thereon a provision advising the buyer to obtain a mold assessment conducted by a business that follows the guidelines provided by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Residential Property Disclosure Act; required disclosures for buyer to beware, mold.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-22 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-22HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2021-01-21HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1824H1
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103020D-H1
2021-01-21HouseRead second time
2021-01-20HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103020D-H1
2021-01-19HouseReported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-14HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-12HouseAssigned GL sub: Housing/Consumer Protection
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101680D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
551708.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1824
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1824+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1824H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21103020D.pdf
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103020.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1824F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1824FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0001+HB1824
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1102V0004+HB1824
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H11V0030+HB1824
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV0999+HB1824
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S12V0110+HB1824

Bill Comments

feedback