VA HB1822 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund; grant for wastewater conveyance facility; estimates of future funding requests; Stormwater Local Assistance Fund. Authorizes the Director of the Department of Environmental Quality (the Department) to authorize grants from the Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund (the Fund) for the installation of certain wastewater conveyance infrastructure. Any such infrastructure shall (i) divert wastewater from one publicly owned treatment works that is eligible for grant funding to another such eligible treatment works; (ii) divert wastewater to a receiving treatment works that is capable of achieving compliance with its nutrient reduction or ammonia control discharge requirements and that results in a net reduction in total phosphorus, total nitrogen, or nitrogen-containing ammonia discharges; and (iii) result in no more expense to the Fund than would otherwise be incurred to install eligible nutrient removal technology or other treatment technology at the treatment works from which the wastewater will be diverted.
Title
Virginia Water Quality Improvement Fund; grant for wastewater conveyance facility, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0533) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 533 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1822ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19103598D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1822E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (9-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | House subcommittee amendments and substitutes offered |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103598D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1 | 2127.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2131 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
10 | 1 | 2134.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 44.15:29.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |