VA HB1822 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
Pending: House Militia, Police and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Dangerous weapon; place of worship; personal protection. Provides that the term "good and sufficient reason," as used in the exception to the prohibition on carrying dangerous weapons in a place of worship, includes personal protection. This bill codifies an opinion of the Attorney General (4/8/2011).
Title
Place of worship; carrying dangerous weapon personal protection.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] | Del. Richard Bell [R] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Del. Nicholas Freitas [R] | Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Ron Villanueva [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: #1 |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102490D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1822 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1822+hil |