VA HB1822 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apprenticeship-related instruction. Transfers from the State Board for Community Colleges to the Commissioner of Labor and Industry the duty to establish policies for apprentices governing the provision of apprenticeship-related instruction delivered by state and local public education agencies and provide for the administration and supervision of related and supplemental instruction.
Title
Apprenticeship-related instruction; transfers certain duties.
Sponsors
Del. Mamye BaCote [D] | Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Daun Hester [D] | Sen. Monty Mason [D] |
Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0063) | |
2015-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 63 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-23 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/23/15 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1822ER) |
2015-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102185D |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Same As) 2015-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0086)