VA HB1819 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1819
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Rappahannock State Scenic River designation. Adds a 79-mile portion of the Rappahannock River located in Caroline, King George, Westmoreland, Essex, and Richmond Counties to the Rappahannock State Scenic River, a component of the Virginia Scenic Rivers System.
Title
Rappahannock River; designating a 79-mile portion as a component of Va. Scenic Rivers System.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] |
Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Robert Orrock [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) (Y: 70 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-26 | House | VOTE: Passage (70-Y 30-N) |
2021-01-26 | House | Read third time and passed House (70-Y 30-N) |
2021-01-25 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-01-22 | House | Passed by for the day |
2021-01-21 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (13-Y 8-N) |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101130D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1819 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)