VA HB1818 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1818
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Provides that the occupational disease presumption for death caused by hypertension or heart disease will apply for salaried or volunteer emergency medical services personnel who have at least five years of service and are operating in a locality that has legally adopted a resolution declaring that it will provide one or more of such presumptions. The provisions of the bill do not apply to any individual who was diagnosed with hypertension or heart disease before July 1, 2021.
Title
Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (96-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) (Y: 3 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436) | |
2021-03-30 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-15 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-15 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-09 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1818ER) |
2021-03-09 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-27 | House | VOTE: Agreed To (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-27 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (31-Y 7-N) |
2021-02-26 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Surovell, Marsden, Newman |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2021-02-24 | House | Delegates: Heretick, Convirs-Fowler, Ware |
2021-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2021-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 95-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 21200207D-S1 (3-Y 95-N) |
2021-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1818S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 21200207D-S1 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 21200207D-S1 |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1818H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103348D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government |
2021-01-21 | House | Incorporates HB2080 (Convirs-Fowler) |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103348D-H1 |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100558D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2080 (Similar To)
HB2080 (Similar To)
HB1818 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
SB1275 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
SB1275 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
HB2080 (Similar To)
HB1818 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
SB1275 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)
SB1275 (Same As) 2021-03-30 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0437)