VA HB1818 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases. Provides that the occupational disease presumption for death caused by hypertension or heart disease will apply for salaried or volunteer emergency medical services personnel who have at least five years of service and are operating in a locality that has legally adopted a resolution declaring that it will provide one or more of such presumptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; presumption of compensability for certain diseases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
2021-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
2021-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-02-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1818H1
2021-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103348D-H1
2021-02-03HouseRead second time
2021-02-02HouseRead first time
2021-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
2021-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-22HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & General Government
2021-01-21HouseIncorporates HB2080 (Convirs-Fowler)
2021-01-21HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2021-01-21HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103348D-H1
2021-01-21HouseReported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
2021-01-14HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100558D

Same As/Similar To

HB2080 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Left in Labor and Commerce
HB2080 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Left in Labor and Commerce

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
652402(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+sum+HB1818
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1818+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+ful+HB1818H1+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/21103348.pdf
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+oth+HB1818FH1122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H1401V0005+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H14V0041+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H14V0048+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H0202V0012+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+H02V0095+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+HV1436+HB1818
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?211+vot+S02V0073+HB1818

Bill Comments

feedback