VA HB1818 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Parking ordinances; enforcement. Authorizes any county or town with a population of at least 40,000 to provide by ordinance that law-enforcement officers, other uniformed employees of the locality, and uniformed personnel under contract with the locality may issue a summons or parking ticket for a violation of the locality's ordinances or regulations regarding the parking, stopping, or standing of vehicles. Current law creates such authority for any city with a population of at least 40,000. This bill is identical to SB 1044.
Title
Parking ordinances; enforcement by locality with a population of at least 40,000.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. Kathleen Murphy [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] |
Del. David Reid [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 16-N) (Y: 83 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 3-N) (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) (Y: 2 N: 93 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 1-N) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-10 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0459) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 459 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1818ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (24-Y 16-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (83-Y 16-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (83-Y 16-N) |
2019-02-21 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senators: Suetterlein, Black, Mason |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-18 | House | Delegates: Delaney, Bloxom, Yancey |
2019-02-18 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-18 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (36-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 93-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 19106541-S1 (2-Y 93-N) |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (36-Y 4-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1818S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 19106541-S1 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 19106541D-S1 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 12-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (87-Y 12-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101337D |