VA HB1818 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing homes; information regarding family councils. Provides that the State Board of Health shall require each nursing home and certified nursing facility to, upon the request of the facility's family council, send notices and information about the family council mutually developed by the family council and the administration of the nursing home or certified nursing facility and provided to the facility for such purpose to the contact person of the resident's choice up to six times per year. Such notices and information may be included together with a monthly billing statement or other regular communication, and shall be posted in a designated location within the nursing home or certified nursing facility. This bill incorporates
Title
Nursing homes; required by Board of Health to send notices and information about family council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0406) | |
2011-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 406 (effective 7/1/11) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2011-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2011-02-22 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1818ER) | |
2011-02-22 | House: Enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-16 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-15 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Engrossed by Senate as amended | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2011-02-14 | Senate: Read third time | |
2011-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-10 | Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (15-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Education and Health | |
2011-02-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2011-02-01 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-02-01 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-31 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1818H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 11104752D-H1 | |
2011-01-31 | House: Read second time | |
2011-01-28 | House: Read first time | |
2011-01-27 | House: Incorporates HB2388 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Committee substitute printed 11104752D-H1 | |
2011-01-27 | House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N) | |
2011-01-25 | House: Assigned HWI sub: #3 | |
2011-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions | |
2011-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100630D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2388 (Similar To) 2011-01-27 - House: Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions (HB1818-Hope) by voice vote
SB976 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)
SB976 (Same As) 2011-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0412)