VA HB1817 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-8)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Promoting travel for prostitution; penalty. Makes it a Class 1 misdemeanor for any travel agent to knowingly promote travel services for the purposes of prostitution or certain offenses involving minors that require registration on the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution; promoting travel, penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0458)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 458 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1817ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-22SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseConference report agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Peake, Obenshain, Lucas
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-20HouseDelegates: Delaney, Adams, L.R., Collins
2019-02-20HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-20HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-19SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-19SenateSenate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-18HouseSenate substitute rejected by House 19106784D-S1 (0-Y 97-N)
2019-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1817S1
2019-02-14SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19106784D-S1
2019-02-14SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-12SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106784D-S1
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1817H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106268D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106268D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-01HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-01HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100096D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182348.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182513(n/a)See Bill Text
19210.2(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.16(n/a)See Bill Text
192386.35(n/a)See Bill Text
22515.2(n/a)See Bill Text
80142.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB1817
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1817+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1817H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1817S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB1817ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0458+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0129+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0099+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2351+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0259+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0538HB1817+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0633HB1817+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2896+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0783HB1817+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3266+HB1817
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1014HB1817+HB1817

Bill Comments

feedback