VA HB1816 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Property Owners' Association Act; Condominium Act; use of electronic means for meetings and voting. Allows meetings of property owners' associations, boards of directors, unit owners' associations, executive boards, and committees to be held entirely or partially by electronic means, provided that the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, has adopted guidelines for the use of electronic means for such meetings. The bill requires that such guidelines ensure that persons accessing such meetings are authorized to do so and that persons entitled to participate in such meetings have an opportunity to do so. The bill grants authority for determining whether any such meeting may be held entirely or partially by electronic means to the board of directors or executive board, as applicable. Under current law, if a meeting of a board of directors or executive board is conducted by telephone conference or video conference, at least two members of the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, are required to be physically present at the meeting place included in the meeting notice. The bill amends the definition of "electronic means" to provide that meeting conducted by electronic means includes a meeting conducted via teleconference, videoconference, Internet exchange, or other electronic methods. The bill allows members of property owners' associations or unit owners' associations to vote at meetings of such associations by absentee ballot, and allows such members to vote in person, by proxy, or by absentee ballot by electronic means, provided that the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, has adopted guidelines for such voting. Finally, the bill provides that if a vote, consent, or approval required to be obtained by secret ballot is accomplished through electronic means, the electronic means shall protect the identity of the voter, and that if the electronic means cannot protect the identity of the voter, another means of voting shall be used. Property Owners' Association Act; Condominium Act; use of electronic means for meetings and voting. Allows meetings of property owners' associations, boards of directors, unit owners' associations, executive boards, and committees to be held entirely or partially by electronic means, provided that the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, has adopted guidelines for the use of electronic means for such meetings. The bill requires that such guidelines ensure that persons accessing such meetings are authorized to do so and that persons entitled to participate in such meetings have an opportunity to do so. The bill grants authority for determining whether any such meeting may be held entirely or partially by electronic means to the board of directors or executive board, as applicable. Under current law, if a meeting of a board of directors or executive board is conducted by telephone conference or video conference, at least two members of the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, are required to be physically present at the meeting place included in the meeting notice. The bill amends the definition of "electronic means" to provide that meeting conducted by electronic means includes a meeting conducted via teleconference, videoconference, Internet exchange, or other electronic methods. The bill allows members of property owners' associations or unit owners' associations to vote at meetings of such associations by absentee ballot, and allows such members to vote in person, by proxy, or by absentee ballot by electronic means, provided that the board of directors or executive board, as applicable, has adopted guidelines for such voting. Finally, the bill provides that if a vote, consent, or approval required to be obtained by secret ballot is accomplished through electronic means, the electronic means shall protect the identity of the voter, and that if the electronic means cannot protect the identity of the voter, another means of voting shall be used.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Owners' Association Act/Condominium Act; use of electronic means for meetings and voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in General Laws and Technology (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-01-18HouseRead second time and engrossed
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseReported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2021-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21102459D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5511800(n/a)See Bill Text
5511815(n/a)See Bill Text
5511816(n/a)See Bill Text
5511832(n/a)See Bill Text
5511900(n/a)See Bill Text
5511935(n/a)See Bill Text
5511949(n/a)See Bill Text
5511952(n/a)See Bill Text
5511953(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback