VA HB1815 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-30 - Incorporated by General Laws
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Marijuana; legalization of cultivation, manufacture, sale, possession, and testing; penalties. Establishes a regulatory scheme for the regulation of marijuana cultivation facilities, marijuana manufacturing facilities, marijuana testing facilities, and retail marijuana stores by the Board of Agriculture and Consumer Services. The bill also grants localities the authority to enact ordinances establishing additional licensing requirements for marijuana establishments located within such locality and allows the home cultivation of marijuana for personal use under certain circumstances. The bill imposes a tax on retail marijuana and retail marijuana products sold by a retail marijuana store at a rate of 9.7 percent (for a total sales tax of 15 percent) and provides that 67 percent of the revenues collected from the tax be deposited into the general fund and 33 percent of the revenues be deposited into a "Retail Marijuana Education Support Fund" to be used solely for purposes of public education. Finally, the bill establishes several new criminal penalties related to marijuana, as well as modifies some existing criminal penalties.
Title
Marijuana; legalization of cultivation, manufacture, sale, possession, and testing, penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-30 | House | Incorporated by General Laws |
2021-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB2312-Herring) by voice vote |
2021-01-25 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2021-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2021-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100114D |
Same As/Similar To
HB2312 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
HB2312 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
HB2312 (Similar To) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1627 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 228 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 260 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 273 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.8:01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 278.9 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 309.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.48:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 69.48:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 275.8 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 247 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 248.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 251.03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 252 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 254 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 255.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 258 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 258.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 265.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 265.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 265.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 287.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.09 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.1:5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 308.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 460 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 474.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 11.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 120.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 188.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 291.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 299.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 303.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.22 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 389 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 66 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 81.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 83.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3705.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 3711 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 277.08 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 315 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 233 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
3 | 2 | 4113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 225 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |