VA HB1815 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-10 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage restaurant licensees; food-beverage ratio. Provides that a mixed beverage restaurant licensee meets the required food-beverage ratio if its gross receipts from the sale of food and nonalcoholic beverages amount to at least (i) $4,000 per month or (ii) 45 percent of the gross receipts from the sale of mixed beverages and food. Under current law, only the latter option is available.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; mixed beverage restaurant licensees, food-beverage ratio.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-10 | House | Left in General Laws |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely by voice vote |
2015-01-20 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100377D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+sum+HB1815 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?151+ful+HB1815+hil |