VA HB1813 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-24 - Left in Education and Health
Pending: Senate Education and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Practice of veterinary medicine. Eliminates the exception to licensure requirements for veterinarians licensed in other states who are called to attend a case in the Commonwealth and who do not open an office or appoint a place to practice within the Commonwealth. The bill allows the Board of Veterinary Medicine (Board) to grant or renew a license or registration to an applicant who has had a license to practice veterinary medicine, a license to practice as a veterinary technician, or registration to practice as an equine dental technician revoked or suspended due to nonrenewal. The bill also repeals (i) provisions allowing the Board to issue temporary licenses to certain applicants and (ii) provisions related to penalties for violations of statutes governing the practice of veterinary medicine.
Title
Veterinary medicine; practice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | Senate | Left in Education and Health |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health Professions |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Education and Health |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-01-30 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 1-N) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2015-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2015-01-27 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15102505D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3805.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 3809 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |