VA HB1810 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-15 - Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Administration of government; rights of state and local employees; freedoms of conscience and expression. Protects local government employees from being penalized by their employer for expressing their opinion regarding a current or proposed regulation, rule, policy, position, or other action or purpose of a public body at an open meeting of such public body during the time designated for public comment when such employees are speaking on their own behalf as members of the public. The bill exempts from such protection expressions made by state government employees during a public meeting of a committee or subcommittee of the General Assembly or State Corporation Commission.
Title
State and local employees; rights of employees, freedoms of conscience and expression.
Sponsors
Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) (Y: 53 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in General Laws and Technology (9-Y 6-N) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2023-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (53-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (53-Y 47-N) |
2023-02-03 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House |
2023-02-02 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2023-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-31 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-30 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2023-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-24 | House | Reported from General Laws (12-Y 10-N) |
2023-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N) |
2023-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2023-01-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23104182D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1512.4:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 2902.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |