VA HB1810 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1810
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system; deadline extension. Provides that in the event that a failure of the Virginia online voter registration system occurs prior to the close of registration records, the Governor has the authority to order the online voter registration system to be available for registration activities after the date for closing the registration records for a period of time equal to the amount of time during which the online voter registration system was unavailable for registration activities, rounded up to the nearest whole day, plus an additional day to allow for voter education efforts. The extension of registration activities shall apply to in-person registration and mail voter registration applications. Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system; deadline extension. Provides that in the event that a failure of the Virginia online voter registration system occurs prior to the close of registration records, the Governor has the authority to order the online voter registration system to be available for registration activities after the date for closing the registration records for a period of time equal to the amount of time during which the online voter registration system was unavailable for registration activities, rounded up to the nearest whole day, plus an additional day to allow for voter education efforts. The extension of registration activities shall apply to in-person registration and mail voter registration applications.
Title
Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system, deadline extension.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 2-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021 |
2021-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-24 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1810ER) |
2021-02-24 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 0-N 2-A) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101534D-E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1810E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1810E |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101534D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1810 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)