VA HB1810 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system; deadline extension. Provides that in the event that a failure of the Virginia online voter registration system occurs prior to the close of registration records, the Governor has the authority to order the online voter registration system to be available for registration activities after the date for closing the registration records for a period of time equal to the amount of time during which the online voter registration system was unavailable for registration activities, rounded up to the nearest whole day, plus an additional day to allow for voter education efforts. The extension of registration activities shall apply to in-person registration and mail voter registration applications. Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system; deadline extension. Provides that in the event that a failure of the Virginia online voter registration system occurs prior to the close of registration records, the Governor has the authority to order the online voter registration system to be available for registration activities after the date for closing the registration records for a period of time equal to the amount of time during which the online voter registration system was unavailable for registration activities, rounded up to the nearest whole day, plus an additional day to allow for voter education efforts. The extension of registration activities shall apply to in-person registration and mail voter registration applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration; failure of online voter registration system, deadline extension.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2021-01-18HousePrinted as engrossed 21101534D-E
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1810E
2021-01-18HouseEngrossment reconsidered by House
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1810E
2021-01-18HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2021-01-18HouseRead second time
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-13HouseReported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N)
2021-01-05HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2021-01-05HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101534D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242416(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback