VA HB1810 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Wearing a mask; exception to criminal punishment. Provides that the provisions of the Code section punishing the wearing of a mask by a person older than 16 as a Class 6 felony shall not apply to persons wearing cold weather gear that partially covers the face.
Title
Wearing a mask; exception to criminal punishment.
Sponsors
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. James Scott [D] | Del. Roslyn Tyler [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] |
Del. Matthew James [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2013-01-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2013-01-11 | House | Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal |
2013-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102180D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+sum+HB1810 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?131+ful+HB1810+hil |