VA HB1808 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-08 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Public Procurement Act; use of best value contracting; construction and professional services. Authorizes any public body to procure construction on a best value procurement basis using a numerical scoring system consisting of the following: (i) technical solution, 30 percent; (ii) past performance, 30 percent, including (a) price history of cost overruns, (b) schedule history of on-time delivery, and (c) contractor performance ratings from the immediately preceding five-year period; and (iii) price, 40 percent. The Request for Proposal shall contain a notice to potential offerors that the procurement decision will be made on a best value procurement basis. The Request for Proposal shall describe (1) the criteria that will be considered in evaluating the proposals and (2) the numerical scoring system that will be used in evaluating the proposals, including identification of the factors and weight values set forth above.
Title
Virginia Public Procurement Act; use of best value contracting.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] | Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] |
Del. Robert Marshall [R] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Left in General Laws |
2017-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102088D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 5102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
15 | 2 | 6314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 1002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
33 | 2 | 223 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1808 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1808+hil |