VA HB1807 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

State agency compliance with flood plain management regulations. Directs the Department of Conservation and Recreation, no later than September 30, 2023, and in cooperation with numerous Secretariats and the Special Assistant to the Governor for Coastal Adaptation and Protection, to establish standards for development in a flood plain for all state agencies and departments. Such standards shall require at least compliance with the National Flood Insurance Program and shall require that any development undertaken by an agency or department on state-owned land located in a Special Flood Hazard Area be protected or flood-proofed against flooding and flood damage. The bill also requires any state agency or department, when developing a facility on state-owned property located in a flood plain, to either adhere to all local flood plain management regulations or receive Department approval of compliance with the applicable state standard for development in a flood plain, provided that such standard does not jeopardize a locality's participation in the National Flood Insurance Program. Such compliance shall be documented and provided in the form of a permit by the Department to the applicant prior to preliminary design approval of a project by the Department of General Services. The bill allows the Department of Conservation and Recreation to issue a permit if no feasible alternative to developing a facility in the flood plain exists and if one of several other conditions provided in the bill is met.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Flood plain management; state agency compliance with regulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0777)
2023-04-12HouseEnacted, Chapter 777 (effective 7/1/23)
2023-04-12SenateSigned by President as reenrolled
2023-04-12HouseSigned by Speaker as reenrolled
2023-04-12HouseReenrolled bill text (HB1807ER2)
2023-04-12HouseReenrolled
2023-04-12 Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted
2023-04-12SenateSenate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
2023-04-12HouseVOTE: Block Vote Adoption (95-Y 0-N)
2023-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
2023-04-12HousePlaced on Calendar
2023-03-27HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2023-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
2023-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
2023-02-24HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1807ER)
2023-02-24HouseEnrolled
2023-02-21HouseVOTE: Adoption (98-Y 0-N)
2023-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 23106936D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2023-02-17SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1807S1
2023-02-17SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 23106936D-S1
2023-02-17SenateReading of substitute waived
2023-02-17SenateRead third time
2023-02-16SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2023-02-14SenateCommittee substitute printed 23106936D-S1
2023-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources with substitite (15-Y 0-N)
2023-01-25SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2023-01-25SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-01-24HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
2023-01-24HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
2023-01-23HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-01-20HouseRead first time
2023-01-18HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23103942D

Same As/Similar To

SB1392 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)
SB1392 (Same As) 2023-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0762)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
101603(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+sum+HB1807
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1807+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1807S1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1807ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+HB1807ER2+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+ful+CHAP0777+hil
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+amd+HB1807AG
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1807F122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1807FS1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+oth+HB1807FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+H01V0013+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV1072+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+S01V0091+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0538HB1807+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV0550HB1807+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2132+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+HV2414+HB1807
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?231+vot+SV1060HB1807+HB1807

Bill Comments

feedback