VA HB1807 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1807
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health maintenance organizations; insolvency. Updates provisions of the Code of Virginia related to insolvency procedures for health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that were inconsistent with the method to address insolvencies provided for members of the Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association. HMOs became members of the Association following legislation passed during the 2018 Session. Health maintenance organizations; insolvency. Updates provisions of the Code of Virginia related to insolvency procedures for health maintenance organizations (HMOs) that were inconsistent with the method to address insolvencies provided for members of the Virginia Life, Accident and Sickness Insurance Guaranty Association. HMOs became members of the Association following legislation passed during the 2018 Session.
Title
Health maintenance organizations; insolvency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0158) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 158 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1807ER) |
2021-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-01-19 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-18 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101071D-E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1807E |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossment reconsidered by House |
2021-01-18 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1807E |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-01-18 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2021-01-05 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101071D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1807 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)