VA HB1805 | 2021 | 1st Special Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1805

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Aging services; social need. Requires the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services, in providing aging services, to use available resources to provide services to older persons with the greatest economic or social needs. The bill defines "economic need" as need resulting from an income level at or below the poverty line. The bill defines "social need" as need caused by noneconomic factors, including (i) physical and mental disabilities, which include developmental disabilities and human immunodeficiency virus; (ii) language barriers; and (iii) cultural, social, or geographic isolation, including that which is related to a history of discrimination for factors such as racial or ethnic status, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation that can affect an individual's ability to perform normal daily tasks or threatens such individual's capacity to live independently.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aging services; economic and social needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 41-N) (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N) (Y: 22 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (25-Y 14-N) (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
2021-03-24 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 299 (effective 7/1/21)
2021-03-15 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
2021-03-15HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2021
2021-03-11HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-09SenateSigned by President
2021-03-09HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1805ER)
2021-03-09HouseEnrolled
2021-02-27HouseVOTE: Agreed To (57-Y 41-N)
2021-02-27HouseConference report agreed to by House (57-Y 41-N)
2021-02-27SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (22-Y 16-N)
2021-02-26 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2021-02-24SenateSenators: Barker, Favola, Reeves
2021-02-24SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2021-02-23HouseDelegates: Adams, D.M., Cole, J.G., Coyner
2021-02-23HouseConferees appointed by House
2021-02-23HouseHouse acceded to request
2021-02-22SenateSenate requested conference committee
2021-02-22SenateSenate insisted on amendments (37-Y 0-N)
2021-02-18HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2021-02-18HouseSenate amendments rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
2021-02-18HousePlaced on Calendar
2021-02-16SenatePassed Senate with amendments (25-Y 14-N)
2021-02-16SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2021-02-16SenateCommittee amendments agreed to
2021-02-16SenateReading of amendments waived
2021-02-16SenateRead third time
2021-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2021-02-12SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendments (11-Y 1-N 1-A)
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N)
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1805H1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103023D-H1
2021-01-18HouseRead second time
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103023D-H1
2021-01-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101846D

Same As/Similar To

HB1805 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
SB1366 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)
SB1366 (Same As) 2021-03-24 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0300)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515134(n/a)See Bill Text
515135(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+sum+HB1805
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1805+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1805H1+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+HB1805ER+hil
Texthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+ful+CHAP0299+hil
Amendmenthttps://committees.lis.virginia.gov/pdfs/drafts/21104409A.pdf
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1805AS
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1805ASE
Amendmenthttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+amd+HB1805AC
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1805FH1122+PDF
Supplementhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+oth+HB1805FER122+PDF
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+H12C0027+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HC0963+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09C0052+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+S09V0007+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0048HB1805+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0062HB1805+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV1729+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0253HB1805+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+SV0511HB1805+HB1805
Roll Callhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?212+vot+HV2003+HB1805

Bill Comments

feedback