VA HB1805 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Aging services; economic and social need. Provides that, in providing aging services, the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services shall prioritize providing services to older persons with the greatest economic or social need. The bill defines "economic need" as need resulting from an income level at or below the poverty line and "social need" as need caused by noneconomic factors, including (i) physical and mental disabilities, which may include developmental disabilities and human immunodeficiency virus; (ii) language barriers; and (iii) cultural, social, or geographic isolation, including that caused by racial or ethnic status, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation that restricts an individual's ability to perform normal daily tasks or threatens such individual's capacity to live independently. Aging services; economic and social need. Provides that, in providing aging services, the Department for Aging and Rehabilitative Services shall prioritize providing services to older persons with the greatest economic or social need. The bill defines "economic need" as need resulting from an income level at or below the poverty line and "social need" as need caused by noneconomic factors, including (i) physical and mental disabilities, which may include developmental disabilities and human immunodeficiency virus; (ii) language barriers; and (iii) cultural, social, or geographic isolation, including that caused by racial or ethnic status, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation that restricts an individual's ability to perform normal daily tasks or threatens such individual's capacity to live independently.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aging services; social need.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N) (Y: 56 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-05SenateContinued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rehabilitation and Social Services (14-Y 0-N)
2021-01-20SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2021-01-20SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2021-01-19HouseVOTE: Passage (56-Y 43-N)
2021-01-19HouseRead third time and passed House (56-Y 43-N)
2021-01-18HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB1805H1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 21103023D-H1
2021-01-18HouseRead second time
2021-01-15HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseCommittee substitute printed 21103023D-H1
2021-01-14HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
2021-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2021-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101846D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
515134(n/a)See Bill Text
515135(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback