VA HB1802 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-07 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Care of companion animals; tethering; penalty. Prohibits tethering of companion animals outdoors unless the owner is outdoors within sight of the animal. A violation of this prohibition is a Class 4 misdemeanor and a second or subsequent violation is a Class 3 misdemeanor.
Title
Companion animals; prohibits tethering of animals outdoors unless owner is outdoors.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-07 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101042D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1802 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1802+hil |