VA HB1801 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Counties, Cities and Towns
Pending: House Counties, Cities and Towns Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional rezoning proffers. Makes extensive changes Conditional rezoning proffers. Makes extensive changes to conditional zoning provisions first enacted in 2016. Specific amendments include provisions stating that no locality shall "require" any unreasonable proffer. Under current law, no locality may "request or accept" any unreasonable proffer. Other changes include (i) an expansion of the definitions of "public safety facility improvement" and "public school facility improvement"; (ii) allowing an applicant to submit any offsite proffer that the applicant deems reasonable and appropriate, as conclusively evidenced by the signed proffers; and (iii) provisions stating that nothing in the bill shall be deemed or interpreted to prohibit communications between an applicant or owner and the locality or shall be deemed or interpreted to prohibit presentation, analysis, or discussion of the potential impacts of new residential development or other new residential use on the locality's public facilities either onsite or offsite that are specifically attributable to such development. Final enactments state that (a) the bill shall be effective as to any application for a rezoning or proffer condition amendment filed on or after July 1, 2019, or to certain other pending applications, and (b) an applicant with a pending application for a rezoning or proffer condition amendment that was filed prior to July 1, 2016, may elect to proceed under the law as it existed prior to that date, and an applicant with a pending application for a rezoning or proffer condition amendment filed on or after July 1, 2016, but before July 1, 2019, may elect to proceed under the law as it existed during
Title
Conditional rezoning proffers; extensive changes to zoning provisions.
Sponsors
Del. Lee Ware [R] | Sen. John McGuire [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Counties, Cities and Towns |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (3-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-14 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-12-28 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-12-28 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101725D |