VA HB180 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Records of marriages; identification of race. Eliminates the requirement that the race of married parties be included in marriage records, divorce reports, and annulment reports filed with the State Registrar. The bill also removes the requirement that the State Registrar include race data in the compilation and posting of marriage, divorce, and annulment data.
Title
Marriage records; divorce and annulment reports, eliminates requirement for identification of race.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] | Del. Nancy Guy [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] |
Del. Sam Rasoul [D] | Sen. Danica Roem [D] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] | Del. Rodney Willett [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0209) | |
2020-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 209 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-06 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-06 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 6, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB180ER) |
2020-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (32-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-31 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB180H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20105992D-H1 |
2020-01-31 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB1425 (Sullivan) |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB1158 (Lopez) |
2020-01-28 | House | Incorporates HB141 (Davis) |
2020-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 20105992D-H1 |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Health |
2019-12-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-12-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101823D |
Same As/Similar To
HB141 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1158 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1425 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
SB62 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0210)
SB1066 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
HB1066 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)
HB1158 (Similar To) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
HB1425 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Incorporated by Health, Welfare and Institutions
SB62 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0210)
SB1066 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0211)
HB1066 (Same As) 2020-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0815)