VA HB1799 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-31 - Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Opioid Abatement Authority; membership. Increases from 11 to 13 the membership of the Opioid Abatement Authority board of directors by adding two representatives of the addiction and recovery community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opioid Abatement Authority; increases membership.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-01-31 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-01-31HouseStricken from docket by Health, Welfare and Institutions (20-Y 0-N)
2023-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (4-Y 0-N)
2023-01-19HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102480D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222367(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback