VA HB1799 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Interest on fines and costs in criminal cases and traffic infractions. Eliminates the accrual of interest on any fine or costs imposed in a criminal case or in a case involving a traffic infraction. The bill provides that any such fine or costs that have accrued interest prior to July 1, 2019, shall cease to accrue interest on July 1, 2019, and such accrued interest may be waived by any court. A person who owes fines and costs on which interest has accrued may move any court in which he owes fines and costs to waive the interest that accrued on such fines and costs and shall have such interest waived for any period of incarceration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal cases and traffic infractions; eliminates accrual of interest on fines and costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
2019-01-25HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105724D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2018-12-28HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2018-12-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100099D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192353.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback