VA HB1796 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Special license plates; Virginia National Guard retirees. Removes the fee for the issuance of a special license plate for retired members of the Virginia National Guard. Currently, such special license plates cost the same as the prescribed cost for a typical Virginia license plate.
Title
License plates, special; removes fee for issuance to Va. National Guard retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-19 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2021-02-03 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2021-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-29 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation & Public Safety |
2021-01-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-21 | House | Reported from Transportation (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-12 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Innovations and General Topics |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2021-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100745D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1796 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Transportation (15-Y 0-N)