VA HB1795 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Student voters; Virginia voter registration. Requires each public high school and public institution of higher education to provide to any enrolled student who is of voting age or otherwise eligible to register to vote access to Virginia voter registration information and applications.
Title
Student voters; Virginia voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-12 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102458D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 203.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
23 | 1 | 401.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |