VA HB1793 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Voter registration through the Department of Motor Vehicles; optional transmission of information. Provides that customers of the Department of Motor Vehicles shall be presented with the option to have their relevant information transmitted to the Department of Elections for voter registration purposes in accordance with federal law. Currently, this information is transmitted unless the DMV customer specifically declines to have such information transmitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voter registration through the Department of Motor Vehicles; optional transmission of information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14SenatePassed by indefinitely in Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
2023-02-08SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2023-02-07HouseVOTE: Passage (52-Y 47-N)
2023-02-07HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
2023-02-06HouseRead second time and engrossed
2023-02-05HouseRead first time
2023-02-03HouseReported from Privileges and Elections (12-Y 10-N)
2023-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N)
2023-01-30HouseAssigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1
2023-01-10HouseReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2023-01-10HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23100848D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
242411.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback