VA HB1793 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Public schools; lock-down drills; notice to parents. Requires every public school to provide the parents of enrolled students with at least 24 hours' notice before the school conducts any lock-down drill.
Title
Public schools; lock-down drills, notice to parents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Education |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2019-01-11 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-12-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2018-12-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101936D |