VA HB1793 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Burn ban; exception for freeze protection of orchard or vineyard. Adds an exception to the ban on fires from February 15 through April 30 of each year for fire set for the prevention of damage to orchards or vineyards by frost or freezing temperatures.
Title
Burn ban; exception for frost or freeze protection of orchard or vineyard.
Sponsors
Del. Matt Fariss [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0006) | |
2017-02-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 6 (effective 7/1/17) | |
2017-02-09 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 16, 2017 | |
2017-02-09 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/9/17 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-08 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1793ER) |
2017-02-08 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-01-30 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-30 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 17103561D-E |
2017-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1793E |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2017-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2017-01-26 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-25 | House | Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 0-N) |
2017-01-12 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Agriculture |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103561D |