VA HB1791 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Governor: Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Conference Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Conspiracy; incitement, etc., to riot; public safety personnel; penalty. Provides that any person who conspires with others to cause or produce a riot against, or directs or incites other persons who participate in a riot to acts of force or violence against, a law-enforcement officer, firefighter, volunteer firefighter, or emergency medical services personnel, engaged in the performance of his public duties, or a member of the Virginia National Guard or the Virginia Defense Force on official state or federal duty is guilty of a Class 3 felony. The bill also eliminates the existing provision that prohibits any person from soliciting other persons to participate in a riot.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conspiracy, incitement, etc., to riot; penalty when against public safety personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (84-Y 13-N) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N) (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28 Governor: Vetoed by Governor
2017-04-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 5, 2017
2017-04-05HouseCommunicated to Governor
2017-04-05HouseSpeaker ruled Governor's recommendation with a substitute not germane
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's substitute printed 17106014D-H1
2017-03-24HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2017-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
2017-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
2017-02-20SenateSigned by President
2017-02-17HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-17HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB1791ER)
2017-02-17HouseEnrolled
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (84-Y 13-N)
2017-02-15HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 17105318D-S1 (84-Y 13-N)
2017-02-15HouseReconsideration of Senate substitute agreed to by House
2017-02-15HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 5-N)
2017-02-15HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 17105318D-S1 (94-Y 5-N)
2017-02-15HousePlaced on Calendar
2017-02-13SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 18-N)
2017-02-13SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2017-02-13SenatePassed Senate with substitute (22-Y 17-N)
2017-02-13SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1791S1
2017-02-13SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 17105318D-S1
2017-02-13SenateReading of substitute waived
2017-02-13SenateRead third time
2017-02-10SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2017-02-08SenateCommittee substitute printed 17105318D-S1
2017-02-08SenateReported from Courts of Justice with substitute (8-Y 6-N)
2017-01-27SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-27SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2017-01-26HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-26HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2017-01-25HousePrinted as engrossed 17100460D-E
2017-01-25HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB1791E
2017-01-25HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2017-01-25HouseRead second time
2017-01-24HouseRead first time
2017-01-20HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendments (20-Y 0-N)
2017-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (11-Y 0-N)
2017-01-13HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
2017-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2017-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100460D

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
182408(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+sum+HB1791
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1791+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1791E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1791S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1791ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+ful+HB1791H1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H0801V0010+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+H08V0046+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV1621+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+S03V0243+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0464HB1791+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0479HB1791+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0481HB1791+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+SV0482HB1791+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2375+HB1791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?171+vot+HV2395+HB1791

Bill Comments

feedback