VA HB1791 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public institutions of higher education; members; removal; terms. Provides that if a member of the board of visitors of a four-year public institution of higher education or the State Board for Community Colleges fails to attend the meetings of the board for one year or to attend certain required educational programs in his first two years of membership, without sufficient cause, as determined by a majority vote of the board, then the member is removed from office. The bill requires the board of visitors of each four-year public institution of higher education and the State Board for Community Colleges to adopt policies regarding the removal process and referencing the Governor's removal authority. The bill repeals existing provisions regarding the removal of members. The bill also prohibits a member who has served for two successive four-year terms from being eligible for reappointment to a board for four years after the end of his second successive four-year term. Finally, the bill changes the terms of the board of visitors of George Mason University to prohibit members from serving more than two successive four-year terms; current law prohibits members of that board from serving more than two four-year terms, successive or not.
Title
Higher educational institutions; removal of members of board of visitors, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-18 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0560) | |
2015-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 560 (effective 7/1/15) | |
2015-02-25 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015 | |
2015-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-02-23 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-02-23 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1791ER) |
2015-02-23 | House | Enrolled |
2015-02-18 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-18 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (92-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Martin agreed to |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2015-02-16 | Senate | Read third time |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2015-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2015-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1791H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 15104360D-H1 |
2015-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2015-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-02 | House | Committee substitute printed 15104360D-H1 |
2015-02-02 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2015-01-23 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-01-13 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103515D |