VA HB1790 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - (67 affirmative votes required to override)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative Process Act; development and periodic review of regulations; report. Requires agencies to develop regulations in the least burdensome and intrusive manner possible and provides guiding principles for the development, adoption, and repeal of regulations. The bill also requires each agency to establish a schedule over a 10-year period for the review of all regulations for which the agency is the primary responsible agency. The schedule shall provide for the annual review of at least 10 percent of an agency's regulations by July 1 of each year. Under the bill, the Governor will submit an annual report containing the findings of the regulation reviews by August 1 of each year to the chairmen of the standing committees of the House of Delegates and the Senate.
Title
Administrative Process Act; development and periodic review of regulations, report.
Sponsors
Del. Scott Lingamfelter [R] | Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Steven Landes [R] | Del. James LeMunyon [R] |
Del. Rick Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) (Y: 66 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) (Y: 20 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | (67 affirmative votes required to override) |
2017-04-05 | House | VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (66-Y 34-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | House sustained Governor's veto (66-Y 34-N) |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-03-24 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2017-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017 | |
2017-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1790ER) |
2017-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (21-Y 19-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Chair votes No |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N) |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2017-02-06 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (63-Y 34-N) |
2017-02-03 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2017-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported from General Laws (15-Y 7-N) |
2017-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2017-01-16 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2017-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17100741D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 2 | 4005.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4007.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
2 | 2 | 4017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |