VA HB1789 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1789
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions. Extends from three months to five months after the end of a fiscal year the period within which certain authorities, commissions, districts, or other political subdivisions with an unelected governing body must have an annual financial transactions audit performed and filed with the Auditor of Public Accounts. The bill retains the three-month audit requirement for each authority, commission, district, or other political subdivision with an unelected governing body and which is required to be reported in the Commonwealth's Comprehensive Annual Financial Report as determined by the State Comptroller and the Auditor of Public Accounts. Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions. Extends from three months to five months after the end of a fiscal year the period within which certain authorities, commissions, districts, or other political subdivisions with an unelected governing body must have an annual financial transactions audit performed and filed with the Auditor of Public Accounts. The bill retains the three-month audit requirement for each authority, commission, district, or other political subdivision with an unelected governing body and which is required to be reported in the Commonwealth's Comprehensive Annual Financial Report as determined by the State Comptroller and the Auditor of Public Accounts.
Title
Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0127) | |
2021-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 127 (effective 7/1/21) | |
2021-03-01 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021 | |
2021-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 20201 |
2021-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1789ER) |
2021-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Rules (11-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1789H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103285D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103285D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101335D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1789 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)