VA HB1789 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1789
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions. Extends from three months to five months after the end of its fiscal year the period within which certain authorities, commissions, districts, or other political subdivisions with an unelected governing body must have an annual financial transactions audit performed and filed with Auditor of Public Accounts. The bill retains the three month audit requirement for each authority, commission, district, or other political subdivision with an unelected governing body and which is required to be reported in the Commonwealth's Comprehensive Annual Financial Report as determined by the State Comptroller and the Auditor of Public Accounts. Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions. Extends from three months to five months after the end of its fiscal year the period within which certain authorities, commissions, districts, or other political subdivisions with an unelected governing body must have an annual financial transactions audit performed and filed with Auditor of Public Accounts. The bill retains the three month audit requirement for each authority, commission, district, or other political subdivision with an unelected governing body and which is required to be reported in the Commonwealth's Comprehensive Annual Financial Report as determined by the State Comptroller and the Auditor of Public Accounts.
Title
Auditor of Public Accounts; audits of certain political subdivisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-04 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1789H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 21103285D-H1 |
2021-02-03 | House | Read second time |
2021-02-02 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee substitute printed 21103285D-H1 |
2021-02-01 | House | Reported from Finance with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) |
2021-01-23 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2021-01-22 | House | Referred from Rules by voice vote |
2021-01-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2021-01-01 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101335D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1789 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Rules (15-Y 0-N)