VA HB1786 | 2021 | 1st Special Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1786
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (5-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-22 - Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (5-Y 10-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Minimum wage; farm laborers or farm employees. Eliminates the exemptions from Virginia's minimum wage requirements for (i) persons employed as farm laborers or farm employees and (ii) certain temporary foreign workers. Minimum wage; farm laborers or farm employees. Eliminates the exemptions from Virginia's minimum wage requirements for (i) persons employed as farm laborers or farm employees and (ii) certain temporary foreign workers.
Title
Minimum wage; farm laborers or farm employees.
Sponsors
Del. Jeion Ward [D] | Del. Elizabeth Guzman [D] | Del. Shelly Simonds [D] | Del. Betsy Carr [D] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Alfonso Lopez [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (5-Y 10-N) (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House: Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-22 | Senate | Failed to report (defeated) in Commerce and Labor (5-Y 10-N) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N) |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2021-02-02 | House | VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-02 | House | Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N) |
2021-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 21101349D-E |
2021-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB1786E |
2021-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2021-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2021-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-28 | House | Reported from Labor and Commerce with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N) |
2021-01-14 | House | Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce |
2020-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101349D |
Same As/Similar To
HB1786 (Carry Over) 2021-02-05 - Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)