VA HB1785 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-28 - Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (19-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Employment health and safety standards; heat illness prevention. Requires the Safety and Health Codes Board to adopt regulations establishing standards designed to protect employees from heat illness, defined in the bill. The measure authorizes an employee to bring an action based on a violation of such standards in which injunctive relief and monetary damages may be sought.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employment health and safety standards; heat illness prevention.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-28 - House - House: Stricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28HouseStricken from docket by Labor and Commerce (19-Y 0-N)
2021-01-26HouseSubcommittee recommends striking from docket (8-Y 0-N)
2021-01-19HouseAssigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #1
2020-12-31HouseReferred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
2020-12-31HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101346D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40144.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback